This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/23/2022 at 19:38:11 (UTC).

IN RE ENDER H.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 IN RE ENDER H was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0582

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

Defendants and Appellants

Jose G.

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Ender H.

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Jacob H.

Appellants and Not Yet Classified

Ender H.

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Jacob H.

Others

P. C.

Hon. Lisa A. Brackelmanns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Navid Nakhjavani

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

350 South Figueroa Street, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Gina Zaragoza

Attorney at Attorney at Law

7220 Owensmouth Avenue, #220

Canoga Park, CA 91303

Lori N. Siegel

Attorney at Attorney at Law

26500 Agoura Road, Suite 102-238

Calabasas, CA 91302

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Appellant: Ender H. Attorney: Lori N. Siegel Appellant: Jacob H. Attorney: Lori N. Siegel **Court of Appeal recommends the opinion not be published on the ground it does not meet the standards of publication.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311003; Disposition: Reversed in Full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP04185; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP04185A; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP04185B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori N. Siegel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina Zaragoza