This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/21/2022 at 00:14:14 (UTC).

In re E.M.; CFS v. S.M. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 In re E M CFS filed an Other lawsuit against M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9016

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendants and Appellants

S. M.

E. C.

Not Yet Classified

E. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: motion for relief; This matter has been dismissed. Please read order "This order does not prejudice appellants' right to file notices of intent to file a writ petition and motions for relief from default on or before 10 days from the date of this order". Order was filed 5/19/22 the 10 days have past. Also you must file a notice of intent and file the relief under that case number, not this one.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, the appeal is dismissed. This order does not prejudice appellants' right to file notices of intent to file a writ petition and motions for relief from default on or before 10 days from the date of this order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd May 12, 2022 and appeals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd May 16, 2022; E.C. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd May 16, 2022; S.M. (Mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J289055; Trial Court Judge: Poncin, Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant