This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/19/2022 at 01:47:41 (UTC).

In re EDIN COLLINS on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 In re EDIN COLLINS on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dekreon, Gail. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5221

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dekreon, Gail

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Edin Collins

Respondent

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Mamta Ahluwalia

Attorney at San Francisco Public Defender's Office

555 Seventh Street

San Francisco, CA 94103

Katherine Claire Hubbard

Attorney at Civil Rights Corps

1601 Connecticut Ave Nw, Ste. 800

Washington, DC 20009-1055

Carson Leigh White

Attorney at Civil Rights Corps

1601 Connecticut Ave. Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 2009

Respondent Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office of the District Attorney

350 Rhode Island Street North Building, Suite 400N

San Francisco, CA 94103

Allison G. Macbeth

Attorney at San Francisco District Attorney's Office

350 Rhode Island Street North Building, Suite 400N

San Francisco, CA 94103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: We deny the petition for writ of habeas corpus without prejudice to refiling in the San Francisco County Superior Court. (In re Ramirez (2001) 89 Cal.App.4th 1312, 1319-1320 [habeas petition challenging detention arising out of misdemeanor case should first be heard by superior court]; see People v. Superior Court (Jimenez) (2002) 28 Cal.4th 798, 802-805 [superior court is "appropriate court of appeal" for questions involving disqualification of magistrate under Code Civ. Proc., 170.3]; In re Hillery (1962) 202 Cal.App.2d 293, 294 ["[T]his court has discretion to refuse to issue the writ as an exercise of original jurisdiction on the ground that application has not been made therefor in a lower court in the first instance."].) Before: Humes, J., Banke, J., and Wiss, J. (Judge of the San Francisco County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: We deny the petition for writ of habeas corpus without prejudice to refiling in the San Francisco County Superior Court. (In re Ramirez (2001) 89 Cal.App.4th 1312, 1319-1320 [habeas petition challenging detention arising out of misdemeanor case should first be heard by superior court]; see People v. Superior Court (Jimenez) (2002) 28 Cal.4th 798, 802-805 [superior court is "appropriate court of appeal" for questions involving disqualification of magistrate under Code Civ. Proc., 170.3]; In re Hillery (1962) 202 Cal.App.2d 293, 294 ["[T]his court has discretion to refuse to issue the writ as an exercise of original jurisdiction on the ground that application has not been made therefor in a lower court in the first instance."].) Before: Humes, J., Banke, J., and Wiss, J. (Judge of the San Francisco County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of reply.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of petitioner's motion to augment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: (Petitioner.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: (From District Attorney.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: Dear Respondent: Your client is named as respondent in the above-captioned writ proceeding, which has been assigned to Division 1. The Court requests that you serve and file an informal response, if any, to the petition on or before May 31, 2022 by 3PM. Your informal response may be in letter form. All filings must be submitted electronically at www.truefiling.com. If you are not filing an informal response, please inform the Court. Counsel are required to list their State Bar numbers on all documents sent to the Court. Petitioner may serve and file an optional reply to the opposition on or before June 3, 2022 by 3PM. In addition to other matters that may be briefed, the parties shall address whether the challenged ruling was rendered by a magistrate, and if so, whether the petition should have been filed in the superior court in the first instance. (See In re Ramirez (2001) 89 Cal.App.4th 1312, 1319-1320 [habeas petition challenging detention arising out of misdemeanor case should first be heard by superior court]; see also People v. Superior Court (Jimenez) (2002) 28 Cal.4th 798, 802-805 [superior court is "appropriate court of appeal" for questions involving disqualification of magistrate under Code Civ. Proc., 170.3].)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Application for Immediate Release Following Order Denying Own Recognizance Release and Setting Money Bail Next Court Date: Tria, May 23, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: 18010601; Trial Court Judge: Dekreon, Gail

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison G. Macbeth