This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/28/2023 at 02:26:57 (UTC).

In re D.F. et al; CFS v. M.M.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 In re D F CFS filed an Other lawsuit against M M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0605

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

M. M.

Not Yet Classified

D. F.

I. F.

L. F.

E. F.

A. M.

Others

R. C.

M. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Melissa A. Chaitin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant is personally granted 30 days to file a letter which must make a showing of good cause that an arguable issue does in fact, exist. Failure to identify any reasonable arguable issues will result in the dismissal of the appeal. If appellant does identify a reasonable issue, the court will direct counsel to brief it.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: M. M. Attorney: Melissa A. Chaitin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 06/21/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: M. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: M. M.Attorney: Melissa A. Chaitin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed incorporating record from case#; Notes: E074256

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel with exhibit form attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: approved JV-183 order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Feb 01, 2023; Prior (E074256)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Feb 01, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Ntc of appeal, JV-180 & JV-183

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jan 30, 2023; M.M. (mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280781

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280782

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280779

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280780

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280778; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less