This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/04/2023 at 00:27:43 (UTC).

In re D.F. et al; CFS v. M.M.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 In re D F CFS filed an Other lawsuit against M M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0605

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

M. M.

Not Yet Classified

D. F.

I. F.

L. F.

E. F.

A. M.

Others

R. C.

M. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (17 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-4 (944 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: dtd Feb 8, 2023; Amended clerk's notification of filing notice of appeal, including legal guardians

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: approved JV-183 order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Feb 01, 2023; Prior (E074256)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Feb 01, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Ntc of appeal, JV-180 & JV-183

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jan 30, 2023; M.M. (mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280781

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280782

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280779

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280780

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J280778; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less