This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/16/2022 at 13:56:18 (UTC).

In re DAVID C. GIUSTI on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 In re DAVID C GIUSTI on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4378

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

David C. Giusti

Ukiah, CA 95482

Respondent

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied. (Streeter, Acting P.J., Brown, J., and Desautels, J.*) * Judge of the Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied. (Streeter, Acting P.J., Brown, J., and Desautels, J.*) * Judge of the Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Mendocino County Superior Court; County: Mendocino; Trial Court Case Number: 21CR03049

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Mendocino County Superior Court; County: Mendocino; Trial Court Case Number: SCUKCRCR2028620

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant