This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/28/2023 at 04:26:38 (UTC).

In re DAVEUM HENRY CASTILLLO on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 In re DAVEUM HENRY CASTILLLO on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6622

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daveum Henry Castillo

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Ronald S. Coen

Office of the Attorney General

Allison H. Chung

Office of the District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: File(s) returned to county clerk.; Notes: one envelope (BA482810)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: Reply filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Response filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Response filed:. Due on 06/14/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: File(s) received from county clerk.; Notes: one envelope (BA482810)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Response filed:. Requested for 06/14/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of habeas corpus filed February 23, 2023, has been read and considered. The People are ordered to file and serve a preliminary response on or before May 15, 2023. Petitioner may file a reply on or before May 29, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less