This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/22/2022 at 21:41:21 (UTC).

In re DARRELL CALDWELL on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 In re DARRELL CALDWELL on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richman, Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8215

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Richman, Craig

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Darrell Caldwell

Respondents

The People

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Frank Duncan

880 West First Street Suite 602

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Respondent Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Craig Richman

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed June 10, 2019, and the informal response, including the sealed documents, filed July 19, 2019. The petition is denied. The restrictions imposed were substantively warranted and the petition does not adequately present a challenge to the procedure by which the restrictions were imposed. B-K I would issue an order to show cause returnable to this court. (Mathews v. Eldridge (1976) 424 U.S. 319, 333 ["[t]he fundamental requirement of due process is the opportunity to be heard 'at a meaningful time and in a meaningful manner'"]; Inmates of Sybil Brand Institute for Women v. County of Los Angeles (1982) 130 Cal.App.3d 89, 107, citing Bell v. Wolfish (1979) 441 U.S. 520, 545.) M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Sealed document filed pursuant to this court's order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits to People's response to petition for writ of habeas corpus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Respondent: The People Attorney: Office of the Attorney General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Office of the Attorney General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The People are directed to file an informal response to the petition on or before July 19, 2019. The People are also directed to file the sealed documents referenced in the respondent court's January 19, 2019 order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.45.) No extensions of the time to file an informal response and the associated sealed documents are contemplated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: (Amended) certificate of service of petition for writ of habeas corpus and supporting documents, etc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Amended certificate of personal service returned for missing appellate case number and declarant's full name (initials are not accepted).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Non-compliance re Proof of Service sent to Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK DUNCAN ESQ.