This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/16/2022 at 14:11:08 (UTC).

In re DANIEL RAMIREZ on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 In re DANIEL RAMIREZ on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Almada, Manuel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0250

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Almada, Manuel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel Ramirez

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Nick Kevin Stewart-Oaten

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defenders Office

320 West Temple Street Ste 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Albert J. Menaster

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender's Office

320 West Temple Street Suite 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Lorraine Lynn Fischer

Attorney at LA County Public Defender's Office

42011 4Th Street West

Lancaster, CA 93534

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Manuel Almada

Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley 42011 4Th Street West, Dept. A04

Lancaster, CA 93534

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed May 12, 2022. The petition is denied because petitioner has an adequate remedy in the trial court. The court notes that petitioner is no longer charged with assault with a firearm, the offense upon which the April 27, 2022 order denying bail was based. Thus, there has been a change in circumstances, and petitioner may properly move for another bail hearing (see In re Annis (2005) 127 Cal.App.4th 1190, 1195-1196, 1199-1200), conducted in accordance with In re White (2020) 9 Cal.5th 455 and In re Humphrey (2021) 11 Cal.5th 135.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant