This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/02/2022 at 01:22:08 (UTC).

In re C.M. et al., Juveniles

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 In re C M , Juveniles was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bejarano, Marissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0389

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bejarano, Marissa

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Defendants and Appellants

L. M.

S. M.

Not Yet Classified

C. M.

M. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Christy Curtis Peterson

P.O. Box 50353

Santa Barbara, CA 93150

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: CT-1 (6 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Mother L.M. and father S.M. are appealing from the same hearing. The appeals will be considered together. The Clerk of the San Diego County Superior Court is directed to prepare a Supplemental Clerk's Transcript within 10 days of the date of this order and to provide a copy of the record to all counsel within the same time period. Appellants' opening briefs will be due 30 days after the Supplemental Clerk's Transcript is filed with this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 6/9/22 by father

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-1 (163 pages); RT-4 (69 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Christy C. Peterson for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed May 9, 2022 by Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case (J520946(A-B))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520946A-B; Trial Court Judge: Bejarano, Marissa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520946; Trial Court Judge: Bejarano, Marissa

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christy Curtis Peterson