This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/28/2022 at 02:26:01 (UTC).

In re C.D.; CFS v. J.D.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 In re C D CFS filed an Other lawsuit against J D. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9759

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

J. D.

Not Yet Classified

C. D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Diana W. Prince

80 Homestead Road

Winthrop, WA 98862-9771

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:; Notes: re Sade C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Applnt granted 30 days to file supp brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. D. Attorney: Diana W. Prince

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 12/22/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. D.; Notes: re Sade C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. D.Attorney: Diana W. Prince

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: applnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/exhibit form attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Diana W. Prince for Mother; time to file AOB extended to Nov 22, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (17 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (109 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute Order dtd Sept 7, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: minute order dtd Sept 6, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Sept 7, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sept 7, 2022; J.D (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J294081; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diana W. Prince