This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/21/2023 at 06:06:05 (UTC).

In re R.C. et al.; CFS v. J.S. et al.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 In re R C CFS filed an Other lawsuit against J S. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0289

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendants and Appellants

J. S.

R. C.

Not Yet Classified, Appellants and Defendants

C. C.

M. C.

R. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Jack A. Love

3053 Rancho Vista Boulevard, H200

Palmdale, CA 93551

Jacob Ivan Olson

3871 Piedmont Avenue, Suite 114

Oakland, CA 94611

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Attorney Jack Love with exhibit form attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Copy of e-mail from attorney Michelle Jarvis regarding conflict representing appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed order vacating and appointing new counsel.; Notes: Attorneu Michelle Jarvis is vacated. Attorney Jack A. Love is appointed for appellant J.S.; AOB extended to Feb 21, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/transmission of exhibits form.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Jacob I. Olson is appointed for appellant, R.C. (Father). AOB due date has been extended to Feb 6, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (59 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute orders dtd Nov 30, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: County clerk extension granted.; Notes: to Dec 22, 2022 to submit record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute Orders dtd Nov 30, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Dec 02, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Dec 02, 2022; prior E079158

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Dec 02, 2022; prior E076894

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Dec 1, 2022; J.S. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J284819; Trial Court Judge: Poncin, Lynn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J284820; Trial Court Judge: Poncin, Lynn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J284818; Trial Court Judge: Poncin, Lynn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack A. Love

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob I. Olson