This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/19/2022 at 00:43:02 (UTC).

In re C.C. et al.; CFS v. C.G.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 In re C C CFS filed an Other lawsuit against C G. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7750

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

C. G.

Not Yet Classified

C. C.

C. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No supplemental brief was filed by appellant re: Sade C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: Appellant's copy of order dtd Nov 17, 2021 forwarded to ADI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Appellate atty Linda Rehm, she does not have an updated address for Mother.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Voice Mail message for:; Notes: Attorney Linda Rehm re: updated address for appellant? Order filed Nov 17, 2021 returned as not deliverable as addressed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Copy of order filed Nov 17, 2021 sent to appellant; Not deliverable as addressed

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Linda Rehm is appointed for appellant. AOB due date is extended to Nov 17, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (68 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (429 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: 2 minute orders dtd Sep 20, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: 2 minute orders dtd Sep 10, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Sep 20, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sep 20, 2021; C.G. (mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J286509; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm