This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/27/2020 at 04:36:19 (UTC).

In re California Water Curtailment Cases

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 In re California Water Curtailment Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7270

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Walsh, Brian

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Central Delta Water Agency

South Delta Water Agency

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District

San Joaquin Tributaries Authority

Byron-Bethany Irrigation District

West Side Irrigation District

Patterson Irrigation District

South San Joaquin Irrigation District

Oakdale Irrigation District

Intervenors and Appellants

State Water Contractors

California Department of Water Resources

California State Water Resources Control Board

Defendant and Appellant

California State Water Resources Control Board

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Dante John Nomellini

Jennifer Lynn Spaletta

Stephen Dean Ruiz

John Henry Herrick

Jeanne Marie Zolezzi

Steven A. Herum

Valerie Cornwall Kincaid

Timothy J. Wasiewski

Jared Stanton Mueller

Lauren D. Bernadett

Stuart Leslie Somach

Theresa Carole Barfield

Michael Eldon Vergara

Tim O'Laughlin

Intervenor and Appellant Attorneys

Jolie-Anne Shappell Ansley

Thomas Martin Berliner

Carolyn Nelson Rowan

Allison Ernestine Goldsmith

Clifford Lee

Matthew George Bullock

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Allison Ernestine Goldsmith

Clifford Lee

Matthew George Bullock

3 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to this court's order dated January 14, 2020, appeals H047270 and H047927 shall be considered together for the purposes of briefing, oral argument, and disposition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Atty Timothy J. Wasiewski as additional counsel representing Oakdale Irrigation District and San Joaquin Tributaries Authority

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The respondent's motion to correct the administrative record is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Briefing sequence order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion, the appeal from the judgment and any appeal(s) from the order on costs shall be considered together for the purposes of briefing, oral argument and disposition. The parties' stipulation on briefing is adopted. The opening briefs shall be due 45 days after the completion of the record in the costs appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: To facilitate prompt resolution of this Judicial Council Coordination Proceeding, the above entitled appeal is assigned to Justice Allison M. Danner for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Plaintiffs/respondents' joint opposition to the California state water resource control board's motion to correct the administrative record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Joinder of intervenor and appellant department of water resources in respondent state water resources control board's motion to correct the administrative record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Intervenor and appellant state water contractors' joinder in appellants California state water resources control board et al.'s motion to correct the administrative record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to correct the administrative record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: Proposed briefing sequence filed by:; Notes: Atty Jennifer Spaletta Proposed briefing sequence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 at 12:10 p.m. by California Department of Water Resources ( Intervenor) West Side Irrigation District v. California Water Resources Control Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 at 4:21 p.m. by State Water Resources ( Intervenor) San Joaquin Tributaries Authority v. California Water Resources Control Board envelope #3222184

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 12:10 p.m. by California Department of Water Resources ( Intervenor) San Joaquin Tributaries Authority v. California Water Resources Control Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 4:25 p.m. by State Water Contractors ( Intervenor) Banta-Carbona Irrigation District v. California Water Resources Control Board envelope #3222231

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 12:10 p.m. by California Department of Water Resources ( Intervenor) Banta-Carbona Irrigation District v. California Water Resources Control Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 4:18 p.m. by State Water Contractors ( Intervenor) Patterson Irrigation District v. California Water Resources Control Board envelope #3222149

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 12:10 p.m. by California Department of Water Resources ( Intervenor) Patterson Irrigation District v. California Water Resources Control Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 by California Department of Water Resources ( Intervenor) Byron-Bethany Irrigation District v. California Water Resources Control Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 8/5/19 by State Water Contractors ( Intervenor) Byron-Bethany Irrigation District v. California Water Resources Control Board (statement of decision in the 1st appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: CV285182; Trial Court Judge: Walsh, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less