This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/01/2022 at 03:19:32 (UTC).

In re A.R., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 In re A R , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Imhoff, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0901

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Imhoff, Michael

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

J. Z.

Not Yet Classified

A. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michelle D. Pena

Attorney at Law Office of Michelle D. Pena

3830 Valley Centre Dr. Suite 705, Pmb 706

San Diego, CA 92130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. Z. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Due Date: 12/28/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: S.D. County Health & Human Services AgencyAttorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. Z.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT - 1 (157 pages), RT - 5 (114 pages), Confidential Envelope - 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed by Mother 9/8/22 (NJ15847)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Vista (1); County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: NJ15847; Trial Court Judge: Imhoff, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle D. Pena