This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/16/2021 at 14:10:27 (UTC).

In Re: Amiodarone Cases

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 In Re Amiodarone Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Seligman, Brad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1762

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Seligman, Brad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Edwin Streed

Defendants and Respondents

McKesson Corporation

Sandoz, Inc.

Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Mayne Pharma, Inc.

Eon Labs, Inc.

Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC

Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC

Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Aurobindo Pharma USA, inc.

Not Yet Classified

Appellate Coordinator, Office of the Attorney General

Consumer Protection Section 300 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

E. Kirk Wood

Attorney at Wood Law Firm, LLC

P.O. Box 382434

Birmingham, AL 35238

Christopher W. Cantrell

Attorney at Doyle APC

550 West B Street, 4Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Alan M. Mansfield

Attorney at Consumer Law Group of California

16870 W Bernardo Drive Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92127

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Tom Prountzos

Attorney at Goodman Neuman & Hamilton LLP

417 Montgomery Street - 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Farley Jay Neuman

Attorney at Goodman Neuman & Hamilton

417 Montgomery Street - 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Natassia Kwan

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

4 Embarcadero Center # 3000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Richard R. Tabura

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1840 Century Park East, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2121

Karin L. Bohmholdt

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

Los Angeles Office 1840 Century Park,East, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

April Sun

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael Cullen Parme

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

550 West "C" St., Ste 1760

San Diego, CA 92101

Stephen Michael Tye

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel

3 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94111-4005

Stephen John Squillario

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel

Three Embarcadero Center Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amir M. Nassihi

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Douglas B. Maddock, Jr.

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

George J. Gigounas

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jeanette Eva Barzelay

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

555 Mission St Ste 2400 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-922

J. Dominic Campodonico

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kathleen Anne Stricklin

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

1 City Blvd W Fl 5

Orange, CA 92868-3677

Lisa Marie Rice

Attorney at WFBM, LLP

1 City Blvd W Fl 5

Orange, CA 92868

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: The parties' stipulation requesting that the above-entitled appeals A161023 and A161762 be consolidated for the purposes of briefing, oral argument, and decision is granted and these appeals are ordered consolidated for those purposes. All future filings shall bear both case numbers. (served on counsels via TrueFiling)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Stipulation to Consolidate Pending Appeals A161023 and A161762 (to court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of Appearance of Richard R. Tabura as counsel for Respondents Sandoz, Inc. and Eon Labs, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of Appearance of Karin L. Bohmholdt as counsel for Respondents Sandoz, Inc. and Eon Labs, Inc.; further notice that Natassia Kwan should be removed from service lists

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Wood Law Firm, counsel for appellant, paid w/check #8037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Edwin Streed Attorney: Alan M. Mansfield Alan Mansfield, attorney for appellants/palintiffs, w/copy of order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Alan Mansfield, attorney for appellants/plaintiffs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Edwin StreedAttorney: Alan M. Mansfield; Notes: Alan Mansfield, attorney for appellants/palintiffs, w/copy of order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 07/23/2020 by Counsel for Plaintiffs Edwin Streed et al. appealing order from 05/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP004956; Trial Court Judge: Seligman, Brad

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EON LABS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where METRIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Appellate Coordinator, Office of the Attorney General is a litigant

Latest cases where Upshers-Smith Laboratories, LLC is a litigant