This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/19/2022 at 04:22:08 (UTC).

In re A.M. et al.; CFS v. V.B.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 In re A M CFS filed an Other lawsuit against V B. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9068

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

V. B.

Not Yet Classified

A. M.

C. B.

M. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Michelle D. Pena

Attorney at Law Office of Michelle D. Pena

3830 Valley Centre Drive Suite 705 Pmb 706

San Diego, CA 92130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Applnt is granted 30 days to file a suppl brief on own behalf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: V. B. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 10/06/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: V. B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: V. B.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: supplemental clerk's transcript filed; Notes: C-1 (85 pgs) (re appeal dtd Aug 2, 2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (292 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel with exhibit form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Michelle Pena for Father

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Four minute orders dtd Apr 19, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Four minute orders dtd Apr 19, 2022 and appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Re prior record E078297; Dtd May 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Re prior record E077251; Dtd May 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd May 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd May 24, 2022; V.B. (father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J287856; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle D. Pena