This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/29/2022 at 02:23:41 (UTC).

In re A.M., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 In re A M , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Imhoff, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9797

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Imhoff, Michael

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Leah Mulvey

Ramona, CA 92065

W. H.

J. B.

R. B.

Defendant and Appellant

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Not Yet Classified

A. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Zimmer Tobin

P.O. Box 4203

Santa Barbara, CA 93140

Linda Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Joellen Renee Alicie

Attorney at Children's Legal Services of San Diego

4801 Viewridge Ave

San Diego, CA 92123-1643

Emily Uhre

4876 Santa Monica Ave., # 119

San Diego, CA 92107

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-4/935pgs., RT-26/2707pgs., Cnf env-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty. Emily Uhre for minor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Recommendation for appointment of appellate attorney for child granted.; Notes: The application of Jo-Ellen Alicie for the appointment of appellate counsel for the child is GRANTED. Appellate Defenders, Inc. is directed to recommend, within 10 days of the date of this order, an attorney to be appointed for the child.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty. Linda Rehm for respondent father.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed recommendation for appointment of appellate attorney for child.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Amy Tobin for Mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed by County Counsel on 12/13/21 ( EJ4137B) (People's Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Vista (1); County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4137B; Trial Court Judge: Imhoff, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Vista (1); County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4137; Trial Court Judge: Imhoff, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Paige Uhre