This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/25/2021 at 00:03:15 (UTC).

In re A.L.; CFS v. Q.L.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 In re A L CFS filed an Other lawsuit against Q L. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6280

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

Q. L.

Not Yet Classified

A. L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Svetlana Kauper

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

385 North Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Robert F. McLaughlin

Attorney at Law Office of Robert McLaughlin

31441 Santa Margarita Parkway Suite A-135

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Q. L. Attorney: Robert F. McLaughlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Q. L.Attorney: Robert F. McLaughlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: San Bernardino County Children and Family Services Attorney: Svetlana Kauper

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 & R-1 (369 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/request for transmission of exhibits form.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Robert Mclaughlin is appointed for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Dec 14, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Dec 14, 2020 and appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 14, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Dec 14, 2020; Q.L. (mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J286438; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert F. McLaughlin