This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/05/2021 at 10:59:15 (UTC).

In re A.J. et al; DPSS v. A.J.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 In re A J DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against A J. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cho, Susanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5664

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cho, Susanne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant

A. J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case in basement storage.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No supp brief by appellant re Sade C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant is granted 30 days to file supp brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. J. Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. J.Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2, R-1 (437 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: amended dtd Sep 16, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Linda Rehm for Father.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd Aug 27, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: minute order dtd Aug 27, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Sep 4, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sep 4, 2020; A.J. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: INJ2000113; Trial Court Judge: Cho, Susanne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm