This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/01/2023 at 07:05:51 (UTC).

In re A.D. et al.; DPSS v. D.F.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 In re A D DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against D F. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McLaughlin, Dorothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9747

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McLaughlin, Dorothy

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Appellant and Defendant

D. F.

Not Yet Classified

A. D.

B. D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Larisa R-McKenna

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange Street, Suite 500

Riverside, CA 92501

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Sarah Marie Vaona

340 South Lemon Avenue, #6192

Walnut, CA 91789

 

Court Documents

E079747

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Miller, Douglas P.; Participants: Ramirez, Manuel A. (Concur) McKinster, Art W. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: D. F. Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Sarah Vaona for Mother; time to file AOB extended to Nov 7, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (44 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (417 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Aug 31, 2022; as to minors A.D. & B.D. (RIJ2100552)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Aug 31, 2022 and appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Sep 8, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Sep 7, 2022; D.F. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIJ2100552; Trial Court Judge: McLaughlin, Dorothy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Marie Vaona