This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/26/2022 at 01:12:36 (UTC).

In re A.C.; CFS v. J.C.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 In re A C CFS filed an Other lawsuit against J C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8850

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

J. C.

Not Yet Classified

A. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. C. Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/13/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: San Bernardino County Children and Family ServicesAttorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. C.Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Copy of counsel appointment order dtd May 2, 2022 sent to appellant. Not deliverable as addressed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/transmission of exhibits form.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Linda Rehm is appointed for the appellant. AOB due date is extended to June 13, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (50 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (325 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Mar 29, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Mar 29, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Apr 14, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Apr 14, 2022; J.C. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J290490; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm