This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/07/2023 at 08:03:38 (UTC).

IN RE A.C.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 IN RE A C was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6266

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

R. C.

Not Yet Classified

A. C.

Z. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Ekenes

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Anna Jo Curry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2022

DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse (vol. 1 of 2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted. The petition for review is denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketDescription: Received additional record; Notes: one doghouse (volume 1 of 2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketDescription: Record requested

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. C. Attorney: Benjamin Ekenes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. C. Attorney: Benjamin Ekenes (Formerly considered with C093821 in the Court of Appeal on December 28, 2021.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C094543; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JV20193242; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JV20193243

[+] Read More [-] Read Less