This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/02/2023 at 09:08:04 (UTC).

IN RE A.C.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 IN RE A C was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6224

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

R. C.

Not Yet Classified

A. C.

Z. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Benjamin Ekenes

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Kaquishka Waverly Turner

Anna Jo Curry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse (vol. 1 of 2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted. The petition for review is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received additional record; Notes: One doghouse (volume 1 of 2).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. C. Attorney: Benjamin Ekenes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. C. Attorney: Benjamin Ekenes C093821 & C094543 were consolidated by the Court of Appeal order filed 12/28/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C094543 C093821 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JV20193242; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JV20193243

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less