This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/03/2022 at 20:30:22 (UTC).

IN RE A.C.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 IN RE A C was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9708

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

R. C.

Not Yet Classified

A. C.

Z. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

625 Court Street, Suite 201

Woodland, CA 95695

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

John Benjamin Ekenes

Attorney at John L. Dodd & Associates

18521 E. Queen Creek Road, Suite 105-420

Queen Creek, AZ 85142

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kaquishka Waverly Turner

Attorney at Dependency Legal Services

618 Main Street, Suite D

Woodland, CA 95695-3606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted. The petition for review is denied. Liu and Cu llar, JJ., are of the opinion the petition should be granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including October 4, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. C. Attorney: John Benjamin Ekenes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. C. Attorney: John Benjamin Ekenes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C093009; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JV20193242; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JV20193243

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaquishka Waverly Turner