This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/18/2022 at 01:29:06 (UTC).

Iloff v. Bridgeville Properties

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Iloff filed an Other lawsuit against Bridgeville Properties. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Canning, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3503

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Canning, Timothy

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Else Iloff

Defendants and Respondents

Bridgeville Properties

Cynthia Lapaille

Not Yet Classified

Consumer Protection Section of the Attorney General's Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Maxim Balter

Attorney at Department of Industrial Relations

455 Golden Gate Ave., 9Th Floor Division Of Industrial Relations

San Francisco, CA 94102

Peter Insung Beck

Attorney at Division of Labor Standards Enforcement

455 Golden Gate Avenue 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Amelia Fairbank Burroughs

Attorney at Janssen Malloy

730 Fifth Street

Eureka, CA 95502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: David Balter appeared on behalf of appellant Amelia Burroughs appeared on behalf of respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Email with 4/28/22 Test Run info

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Email to counsel with BlueJeans OA link

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: May 3, 2022 @ 9:00am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: May 3, 2022 @ TBD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: David Balter appearing on behalf of appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: 22-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Appellants' supplemental request for judicial notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of Joint motion for consolidation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Joint motion for consolidation of A163503 and A163504

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant's Certificate of Interested Entities of Persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Else Iloff Attorney: David Maxim Balter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Else IloffAttorney: David Maxim Balter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/24/2021. Designating 8.124 with RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/19/2021 by Counsel for Plaintiff Else Seviour-Iloff appealing judgment from 07/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Humboldt County Superior Court - Main; County: Humboldt; Trial Court Case Number: CV2000530; Trial Court Judge: Canning, Timothy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amelia Fairbank Burroughs