This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/04/2022 at 08:00:40 (UTC).

Illaga v. Permanente Medical Group et al.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Illaga filed an Other lawsuit against Permanente Medical Group. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brand, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5273

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brand, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Henry Illaga

Respondents and Defendants

Permanente Medical Group

Monica Azevedo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Gary Gwilliam

Attorney at Gwilliam, Ivary, Chiosso, Cavalli & Brewer

1999 Harrison Street - Suite 1600

Oakland, CA 94612-3528

Winston W. Moody

Attorney at Gwilliam Ivary Chiosso Cavalli & Brewer

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1600

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Joseph Christian

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

400 Capitol Mall Suite 1600

Sacramento, CA 95814

Kelsey F. Morris

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

400 Capitol Mall Suite 1600

Sacramento, CA 95814

Dylan B. Carp

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Velma Keam Lim

Attorney at Kroloff Belcher Smart et al

7540 Shoreline Dr

Stockton, CA 95219

Jamie Marie Bossuat

Attorney at Kroloff Belcher Smart Perry & Christophe

7540 Shoreline Drive

Stockton, CA 95219

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Due 90 days after AOB is filed, per stipulation filed 7/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 09/13/2022 By 57 Day(s) Extend deadline for opening brief to 9/13/22; extend deadline for respondent's brief 60 days after AOB is filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of appearance of Dylan Carp, Jackson Lewis P.C., as attorney for respondent Permanente Medical Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: For Kroloff Belcher Smart, attorneys for respondent Azevedo; Jamie Bossuat will also work on this case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-3(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 05/27/2022. Designating 8.124 with RT(3 volumes attached).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Henry Illaga Attorney: Winston W. Moody Copy of judgment and order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Gwilliam Ivary, attorneys for appellant Ilaga No interested parties as defined by CRC 8.208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Proposed civil case information statement, from Gwilliam Ivary, attorneys for appellant Ilaga; statement did not include copy of order/judgment being appealed. Counsel notified via e-mail and TrueFiling notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Permanente Medical GroupAttorney: Dylan B. Carp; Notes: Due 90 days after AOB is filed, per stipulation filed 7/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 09/13/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Henry IllagaAttorney: J. Gary Gwilliam Attorney: Winston W. Moody

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Henry IllagaAttorney: Winston W. Moody; Notes: Copy of judgment and order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # D5009244, InfoTrack US, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 05/20/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Henry Illaga appealing judgment from 03/23/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19009039; Trial Court Judge: Brand, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Christian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lim, Velma K