This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/15/2022 at 22:12:58 (UTC).

I.E. Synergy Properties, LLC v. The Superior Court; Timothy Brown

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 I E Synergy Properties, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Timothy Brown. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mann, Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9218

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mann, Douglas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

I.E. Synergy Properties, LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Bernardino County

Interested Party

Timothy Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jan Karel Buddingh

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

101 W. Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Kenneth Scott Perri

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

101 W. Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Interested Party Attorneys

Taylor Marie Prainito

Attorney at Southern California Labor Law Group, PC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael Alan Zelman

Attorney at Southern California Labor Law Group, PC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew Steven Doriott

Attorney at Southern California Labor Law Group, PC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: Request for immediate stay is also denied. Ramirez Fields Slough

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Corrected 3 vols

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Vol 1 of amended exhibits; indicate "Volume 1 of 3" and include only the page numbers in this volume.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Amended petition; please add "Amended" to the cover page; pagination is incorrect. Amended exhibits; please add "Amended" to the cover pages; each volume cover needs to have the inclusive page numbers.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 3 vols

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate w/ request for immediate stay

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Bernardino County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DORIOTT ANDREW STEVEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRAINITO TAYLOR M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZELMA, MICHAEL A.