This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/06/2021 at 02:17:52 (UTC).

Ideafarm v.Superior Court

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Ideafarm filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lie, Cynthia and Kulkarni, Sunil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8334

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Sixth Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Lie, Cynthia

Kulkarni, Sunil

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wo Of Ideafarm

Mountain View, CA 94042

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Nicole Clemens Wright

Attorney at City of Mountain View

500 Castro St Po Box 7540

Mountain View, CA 94039

Krishan Singh Chopra

Attorney at Mountain View City Attorney's Office

Senior Assistant City Attorney 500 Castro St Ste 300

Mountain View, CA 94041

Lance Bayer

Attorney at City Attorney's Office

500 Castro St.

Mountain View, CA 94041

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition summarily denied by order.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The California Supreme Court transferred this matter to this court for consideration in light of Hagan v. Superior Court (1962) 57 Cal.2d 767. This court finds that this petition is substantially identical to a prior petition that was summarily denied by this court. (Ideafarm v. Superior Court, H048293, summarily denied July 29, 2020.) The petition for writ of review is denied as repetitious. (Bamattre-Manoukian, Acting P.J. and Grover, J. participated in this decision.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No opposition has been filed as of this date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: This court has received the enclosed transfer order from the Supreme Court in the above entitled cause. In referring to this matter, please use the case number shown above.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate Originally filed in the Supreme Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed transferring case in.; Notes: The above-entitled matter is transferred to the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District, for consideration in light of Hagan v. Superior Court (1962) 57 Cal.2d 767. In the event the Court of Appeal determines that this petition is substantially identical to a prior petition, the repetitious petition must be denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krishan Singh Chopra

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Clemens Wright