This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/26/2021 at 04:23:00 (UTC).

IDEAFARM v. S.C. (PEOPLE)

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 IDEAFARM filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against C PEOPLE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6049

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wo Of Ideafarm

Mountain View, CA 94042

Respondent

Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North 1St Street, Suite A

San Jose, CA 95113

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Lance Edward Bayer

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

500 Castro Street

San Francisco, CA 94127

Nicole Clemens Wright

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

500 Castro Street

Mountain View, CA 94043

Attorney General - San Francisco Office

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Krishan Singh Chopra

Attorney at Mountain View City Attorney's Office

Senior Assistant City Attorney 500 Castro Street, Suite 300

Mountain View, CA 94041

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Wo Of Ideafarm Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H048334; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: AP002147; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: B1049374; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: B1050824

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Edward Bayer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Clemens Wright