This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/20/2021 at 03:11:38 (UTC).

I. (ROBERT) v. B. (ALISA)

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 I ROBERT filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against B ALISA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8681

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Robert I.

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Appellant and Intervenor

Laurence B.

Defendant

Alisa B.

Atherton, CA 94027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

John R Larson

Attorney at Law Office of John R. Larson

1211 Newell Avenue, Suite 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Appellant and Intervenor Attorney

George P. Eshoo

Attorney at Law Offices of George P. Eshoo

702 Marshall Street, Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file folder, 2 file jackets, 1 box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file folder, two file jackets, one box.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: amended proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Intervener and Appellant: Laurence B. Attorney: George P. Eshoo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A157943; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: HF11598669

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSON, JOHN R.