This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/20/2023 at 01:08:12 (UTC).

Huth v. Cosby

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 Huth filed an Other lawsuit against Cosby. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karlan, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4337

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karlan, Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Judy Huth

Appellant and Defendant

William Henry Cosby, Jr.

Other

Timothy J. McCoy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Gloria R. Allred

John S. West

Nathan Goldberg

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michael G. Freedman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: THIRTEEN: reporters.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Reporter's transcript filed. Due on 04/03/2023 By 39 Day(s) Extension request to prepare record filed by court reporter Timothy J. McCoy is granted to April 03, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Reporter's transcript filed. Requested for 04/03/2023 By 39 Day(s) extension request to prepare record filed by court reporter, Timothy J. McCoy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 4, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: William Henry Cosby, Jr. Attorney: Michael G. Freedman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 06/05/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: William Henry Cosby, Jr.Attorney: Michael G. Freedman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: William Henry Cosby, Jr.Attorney: Michael G. Freedman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #1038635 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 26, 2022 by William Henry Cosby, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC565560; Trial Court Judge: Karlan, Craig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less