This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/09/2021 at 23:28:40 (UTC).

HUTCHESON v. S.C. (UBS FINANCIAL SERVICES)

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 HUTCHESON filed an Other lawsuit against C UBS FINANCIAL SERVICES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9890

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Andrew Hutcheson

Respondent

Superior Court of Alameda County

1221 Oak Street, Department 21

Oakland, CA 94612

Interested Party

UBS Financial Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Edward J. Wynne

Attorney at Wynne Law Firm

80 East Sir Francis Drake Boulevard Suite 3G

Larkspur, CA 94939

Marita Murphy Lauinger

Attorney at Clapp & Lauinger LLP

701 Palomar Airport Road, Suite 300

Carlsbad, CA 92011-1028

James Frederick Clapp

Attorney at Clapp & Lauinger LLP

701 Palomar Airport Road, Suite 300

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Michael Rubin

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon

177 Post Street - Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Interested Party Attorneys

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michele Leigh Maryott

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Granted & Transferred to CA 1/2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: Briefs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; transferred to CA 1/2 with directions to issue an order to show cause; Notes: The requests for judicial notice filed on July 16, 2021 and August 17, 2021 are denied. The petition for review is granted. The matter is transferred to the Court of Appeal, First Appellate District, Division Two, with directions to vacate its order denying mandate and to issue an order directing the superior court to show cause why the relief sought in the petition should not be granted. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C. J., Corrigan, Liu, Cullar, Kruger, Groban, and Jenkins, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including October 14, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Andrew Hutcheson Attorney: Michael Rubin Reply to answer to petition filed. Due on 08/20/2021 By 4 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Petitioner: Andrew Hutcheson Attorney: Michael Rubin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of petitioner and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the reply to answer to petition for review is extended to and including August 20, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: by Edward J. Wynne, counsel for petitioner, requesting a 7-day extension to and including August 20, 2021 to file a reply to answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: UBS Financial Services, Inc. Attorney: Bradley Joseph Hamburger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Answer to Petition for Review missing electronic bookmarks. Counsel was asked to resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Petitioner: Andrew Hutcheson Attorney: Edward J. Wynne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Petitioner's Appendix of Exhibits to Petition for Review Exhibits 1-8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Petitioner: Andrew Hutcheson Attorney: Edward J. Wynne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Counsel: The court has granted permission to file the oversized attachments to the petition for review and the petition was filed this date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application filed; Notes: Application to File Oversized Attachments Andrew Hutcheson, Petitioner Edward J. Wynne, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Andrew Hutcheson Attorney: Edward J. Wynne Timely petition for review with deficiency: oversized attachments. Application to file oversized attachments required. Counsel contacted to submit an application as soon as possible.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A159861; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: RG18894787

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBS Financial Services Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Alameda County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARYOTT MICHELE LEIGH