This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/26/2022 at 06:07:09 (UTC).

Hunt v. Simplified Labor Solutions Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Hunt filed an Other lawsuit against Simplified Labor Solutions Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowick, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9792

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bowick, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Andre Hunt

Appellants and Defendants

Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions Inc.

Yusen Logistics Americas Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

James Ross Hawkins

Attorney at James Hawkins APLC

9880 Research Drive, #200

Irvine, CA 92618

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

E. Sean McLoughlin

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burril LLP

One California Plaza, 37Th Floor 300 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Jennifer S McGeorge

Attorney at FordHarrison, LLP

350 S Grand Ave, Ste 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3425

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Andre Hunt Attorney: James Ross Hawkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 12/05/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions Inc.Attorney: E. Sean McLoughlin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Andre HuntAttorney: James Ross Hawkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: RBF was due 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions Inc. Attorney: E. Sean McLoughlin One extension granted for a total of 63 days: 07/05/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 09/06/2022 By 63 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions Inc.Attorney: E. Sean McLoughlin; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 63 days: 07/05/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 09/06/2022 By 63 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: AOB was due 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated April 26, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions Inc. Attorney: E. Sean McLoughlin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions Inc.Attorney: E. Sean McLoughlin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 399959 for $775.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 4/1/2022 by Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV23795; Trial Court Judge: Bowick, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLOUGHLIN EDWARD SEAN