This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/16/2023 at 06:03:09 (UTC).

Forrester v. Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Forrester filed an Other lawsuit against Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Oberholzer, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0465

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Oberholzer, Richard

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Humphrey V. Forrester

Buena Park, CA 90620

Respondent and Defendant

Airborne Systems North America of CA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina L. Shadi

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Amy E. Beverlin

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1400 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

G060465

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents scanned. Missing 7-12-21 notice re: fees due.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Copy emailed and mailed to appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: Filed 2-22-23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Supreme Court order granting relief from default.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: The record is available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S278092 - Filed 1-12-23. From appellant (paper copy).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final Affirmed. (Motoike) Moore Marks; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Motoike, Joanne; Participants: Moore, Eileen C. (Concur) Marks, Linda S. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) Affirmed. (Motoike) Moore Marks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Merits. Cause called. Appellant Humphrey V. Forrester argued in propria persona. Amy Beverlin argued for respondent. Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1: pgs 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Superior Court clerk D. Vences's declaration stating no admin record proceedings were lodged w/the Superior Court, therefore are not included w/record on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: C. Greger, C. Violette.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on: 07/22/21 Proceeding under rule 8.124 w/RT and admin record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS aplt email listed doesn't match email used for POS via Truefiling.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By aplt.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: The notice of appeal filed with the Civil appellate division of the Orange County Superior Court was not accompanied by a $775.00 filing fee as required by Government Code section 68926, an application for a waiver of court fees and costs on appeal under California Rules of Court, rule 3.50 et seq., or an order granting such an application pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(b)(1). The appeal will be dismissed unless, within 15 days of the date of this notice, you either transmit the filing fee of $775.00 or file an application for a waiver under rule 3.50 et seq. if you have not previously filed such an application.Mailed to Aplt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLT: Humphrey V. Forrester

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01006085; Trial Court Judge: Oberholzer, Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less