This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/15/2022 at 00:36:50 (UTC).

Humboldt County Department of Health and Human Services v. K.S. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 Humboldt County Department of Health and Human Services filed an Other lawsuit against K S. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hinrichs, Joyce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4570

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hinrichs, Joyce

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Humboldt County Department of Health and Human Services

Defendants and Appellants

K. S.

R. O.

Not Yet Classified

L. O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

825 Fifth Street

Eureka, CA 95501

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Linda J. Conrad

Attorney at Law Offices of Linda J. Conrad

1520 E. Covell Blvd., Ste. B5, Pmb 145

Davis, CA 95616

First District Appellate Project

475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Linda Sue Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Richard Ortiz Attorney: Linda Sue Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Richard OrtizAttorney: Linda Sue Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Humboldt County Department of Health and Human Services Attorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 08/15/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kendra SilvaAttorney: Linda J. Conrad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Humboldt County Department of Health and Human ServicesAttorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Humboldt County Department of Health and Human Services Attorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Humboldt County Department of Health and Human ServicesAttorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 07/06/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 07/06/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: County Counsel re motion to augment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: from attorney Linda Conrad for appellant K.S. 1. RT - 4/8/2021 15-day EOT requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record Filed AOB Due in 30 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1,C-2 Files are Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Linda Rehm / Independent / 40 days as to appellant Father R.O.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Linda Conrad / Independent / 40 days as to appellant Mother K.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on 2/15/22 by Defendant K.S. (Mother) Filed on 2/17/22 by Defendant R.O. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: *****FAST TRACK APPEAL*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: *****FAST TRACK APPEAL*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Humboldt County Superior Court - Main; County: Humboldt; Trial Court Case Number: JV2000123; Trial Court Judge: Hinrichs, Joyce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Humboldt County Department of Health & Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda J. Conrad

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm