This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/12/2023 at 11:17:47 (UTC).

Ventura County Human Services Agency v. J.C. **FAST TRACK J 366**

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Ventura County Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against J C FAST TRACK J 366. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Covarrubias, Manuel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0613

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Covarrubias, Manuel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Ventura County Human Services Agency

Appellant

J. C.

Not Yet Classified

J. Y.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Appellant Attorneys

Donna Powell Chirco

California Appellate Project

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Amy Joy Cannon

 

Court Documents

B320613

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Remanded to trial court with directions; Disposition Type: Final RTC/10 pages/GB; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Gilbert, Arthur; Participants: Baltodano, Hernaldo J. (Concur) Yegan, Kenneth R. (Dissent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) RTC/10 pages/GBThe order terminating parental rights is conditionally reversed. The matter is remanded to the juvenile court with directions to comply with the inquiry provisions of ICWA and sections 224.2 and 224.3. Following the inquiry, if neither HSA nor the court has reason to believe or to know that the minor child is an Indian child, the order terminating parental rights shall be reinstated.Yegan, J., dissenting (1 page)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.; Notes: Wednesday, November 9, 2022, 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Donna Chirco for appellant / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Joseph Randazzo for respondent / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Appellant: J. C. Attorney: Donna Powell Chirco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Appellant: J. C.Attorney: Donna Powell Chirco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Appellant: J. C.Attorney: Donna Powell Chirco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default sent to court appointed counsel.; Notes: ***DEFAULT*** / was due 8-17-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 08/17/2022 By 13 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 08/17/2022 By 13 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney D. Chirco on behalf of appellant (AOB + 30)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (362) Confidential C-1 (15) Digital R-1 (104)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 05/26/2022 by J.C. (father); from 05/10/2022 order terminating parental right and denial of WIC 388 petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J072972; Trial Court Judge: Covarrubias, Manuel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less