This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/06/2023 at 13:02:19 (UTC).

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura v. M.V.**366.26**

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Human Services Agency, County of Ventura filed an Other lawsuit against M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cody, Tari. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7243

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cody, Tari

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura

Appellant

M. V.

Not Yet Classified

Y. V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Appellant Attorneys

Jacques Alexander Love

California Appellate Project

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Thomas Alan Young

 

Court Documents

B317243

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final AFF/7 pages/YGP; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Yegan, Kenneth R.; Participants: Gilbert, Arthur (Concur) Perren, Steven Z. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) AFF/7 pages/YGPThe juvenile court's order terminating Father's parental rights, entered December 17, 2021, is affirmed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.; Notes: Wednesday July 13, 2022, at 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Jacques Love for appellant / WAVIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Joseph Randazzo for respondent / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Wednesday July 13, 2022, at 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Appellant: M. V. Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Human Services Agency, County of Ventura Attorney: Office of the County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Human Services Agency, County of VenturaAttorney: Office of the County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Appellant: M. V. Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Appellant: M. V.Attorney: Jacques Alexander Love

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney J. Love on behalf of appellant (AOB + 30)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (603p) E-RT-5 (257p) CONF.C-1 (21p)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 12-28-2021 by father challenging 12-17-2021 termination of parental rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J072546; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less