This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/17/2020 at 16:03:16 (UTC).

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura v. M.C.**FAST TRACK** PHOENIX H.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Human Services Agency, County of Ventura filed an Other lawsuit against M C FAST TRACK PHOENIX H. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cody, Tari. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3117

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cody, Tari

 

Party Details

Respondent and Petitioner

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura

Appellant

M. C.

Not Yet Classified

P. C.

G. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Appellant Attorneys

Amy Z. Tobin

California Appellate Project

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Thomas Alan Young

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final GPT; Author: Gilbert, Arthur; Participants: Tangeman, Martin J. Perren, Steven Z.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: **HIGH PRIORITY - WIC 366.26 JUV. APPEAL**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned.; Notes: CAO returned; not in custody

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Amy Tobin for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Appellant: M. C. Attorney: California Appellate Project

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: M. C.Attorney: California Appellate Project

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-4 (879), Conf. CT-1 (29), Digital RT-9 (130)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 12-19-19 by M.C. (mother); from WIC 366 order terminating parental rights dtd 11-19-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J071927; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J071926; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less