This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/12/2023 at 14:00:27 (UTC).

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura v. D.F. *PHOENIX H.*

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Human Services Agency, County of Ventura filed an Other lawsuit against D F PHOENIX H. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cody, Tari. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6548

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cody, Tari

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura

Defendant and Appellant

D. F.

Not Yet Classified

A. G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

Patricia K. Saucier

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Amy Joy Cannon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final YPT; Author: Yegan, Kenneth R.; Participants: Tangeman, Martin J. Perren, Steven Z.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No SPB filed; was due 03/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: D. F. Attorney: Patricia K. Saucier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Phoenix H. Brief; Brief must also state that the record and brief have been sent to appellant. Also, please correct the caption page to reflect Ventura County and not LA County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: D. F.Attorney: Patricia K. Saucier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Phoenix H. brief filed. Due on 02/17/2022 By 14 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Phoenix H. brief filed. Requested for 02/17/2022 By 14 Day(s) 2/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Patricia Saucier for appellant (AOB + 30)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-3 (590), RT-11 (205), Confidential CT-1 (14)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 11-24-21 by D.F. (Mother); from WIC 366.26 order dtd 11-17-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J072611; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less