This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/29/2023 at 09:03:23 (UTC).

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura v. C.C. **366.26**

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Human Services Agency, County of Ventura filed an Other lawsuit against C C 366 26. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cody, Tari. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8413

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cody, Tari

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Human Services Agency, County of Ventura

Appellant and Defendant

C. C.

Not Yet Classified

K. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Karen B. Stalter

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Andrew Wolf

 

Court Documents

B318413

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Remanded to trial court with directions; Disposition Type: Final RTC/7 pages/PG; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Perren, Steven Z.; Participants: Yegan, Kenneth R. (Dissent) Gilbert, Arthur (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) RTC/7 pages/PG Yegan, J., Dissenting /1 page

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.; Notes: Wednesday, August 10, 2022 at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Joseph Randazzo for respondent / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Karen B. Stalter for appellant / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Wednesday, August 10, 2022 at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: C. C. Attorney: Karen B. Stalter Time elapsed / was due 6-15-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: C. C.Attorney: Karen B. Stalter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/27/2022 By 7 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 04/27/2022 By 7 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Stalter aptd to rep appellant CC, aob due in 30 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-3 (574p) ERT-12 (177p) Conf. CT-1 (23p)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 2-16-2022 by mother challenging 2-9-22 termination of parental rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J072581; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less