This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/01/2022 at 03:10:55 (UTC).

Hulse v. Ehlow

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Hulse filed an Other lawsuit against Ehlow. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3160

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Sandra Robin Hulse

Defendant and Respondent

Andrew C. Ehlow

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Ronald R Roundy

Attorney at Attorneys Real Estate Group, APC

516 Gibson Drive

Roseville, CA 95678

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Todd Joseph Wenzel

Attorney at Wenzel Law

4225 Solano Avenue # 700

Napa, CA 94558

Jonathan Herschel Bornstein

Attorney at Bornstein & Bornstein Law Group

2701 Telegraph Ave., Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: Appellant having failed to file a brief after notice given under rule 8.220(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court, the appeal is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Appellant having failed to file a brief after notice given under rule 8.220(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court, the appeal is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sandra Robin Hulse Attorney: Ronald R Roundy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sandra Robin HulseAttorney: Ronald R Roundy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of association of attorneys.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent associates Jonathan Herschel Bornstein.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sandra Robin Hulse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sandra Robin Hulse

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: From: Specialized Legal Services, Inc. Check number: 60961 Date issued: 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The court dismissed this appeal on August 24, 2021, for failure to pay the filing fee. On September 22, appellant filed a motion to reinstate the appeal. The motion is conditionally granted as follows. Appellant shall have 21 days to pay the filing fee. Should appellant fail to do so, the appeal will again be dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion for Reinstatement of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Vacated BY THE COURT: Appellant having failed to pay the statutory filing fee in compliance with rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court, after notice having been given pursuant to rule 8.100(c)(1), the appeal filed on July 23, 2021 is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: BY THE COURT: Appellant having failed to pay the statutory filing fee in compliance with rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court, after notice having been given pursuant to rule 8.100(c)(1), the appeal filed on July 23, 2021 is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/02/2021. Designating CT without RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 07/23/2021 by Counsel for Plaintiff Sandra R. Hulse appealing judgment from 05/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Napa County Superior Court - Main; County: Napa; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV000496

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Joseph Wenzel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORNSTEIN, JONATHAN HERSCHEL