This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/05/2022 at 18:03:33 (UTC).

Huh v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 Huh filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cunningham III, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9547

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cunningham III, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hoyoung Huh

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. David S. Cunningham, III

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Grossmont Union High School District

San Diego County Office of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

David Lawrence Schwarz

Attorney at Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick PLLC

1615 M St Nw Ste 400

Washington, DC 20036-3215

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

William Benjamin Shinoff

Attorney at Frantz Law Group, APLC

2029 Century Park East Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-8506

Daniel Robert Shinoff

Attorney at Artiano Shinoff

2488 Historic Decatur Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92106-6113

James Patrick Frantz

Attorney at Frantz Law Group

2029 Century Park East Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Scott Summy

Attorney at BARON & BUDD

11440 West Bernardo Court Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127

Jason James Julius

Attorney at Baron & Budd PC

11440 W Bernardo Ct Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127-1663

Brian J. Panish

Attorney at Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Rachel Tessa Gezerseh

Attorney at Panish Shea & Boyle LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025-3341

Khaldoun Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup Melodia Kelly & Schoenberger, P.C.

650 California St 26 Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

Rahul Ravipudi

Attorney at Panish, Shea & Boyle, LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Victoria Ellen Sherlin

Attorney at Baron and Budd P.C.

11440 W Bernardo Ct Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127-1663

John Paul Fiske

Attorney at Baron & Budd

11440 W Bernardo Ct, Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127-1663

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petitions for writ of mandate filed on December 23, 2021 and April 7, 2022 are consolidated for consideration on the court's own motion. The pro hac vice motions in case B319547 are granted. The petition in case B319547 is denied for failure to state entitlement to extraordinary relief. The petition in case B317203 is dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petitions for writ of mandate filed on December 23, 2021 and April 7, 2022 are consolidated for consideration on the court's own motion. The pro hac vice motions in case B319547 are granted. The petition in case B319547 is denied for failure to state entitlement to extraordinary relief. The petition in case B317203 is dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Petitioner's counsel--Do you intend to update your application to file under seal? The application (filed on 2/28/22) references then-pending motions and suggests there will be an update after the court decides them. (Appl. p. 3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Motion for pro hac vice admission of Michael J. Guzman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Motion for pro hac vice admission of Mark C. Hansen.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego County Office of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where Grossmont Union High School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant