This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/06/2022 at 07:02:43 (UTC).

Huh v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Huh filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cunningham III, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7203

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cunningham III, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hoyoung Huh

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

David S. Cunningham, III

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Grossmont Union High School District

San Diego County Office of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David L. Schwarz

Attorney at Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick

1615 M St Nw Ste 400

Washington, DC 20036-3215

Michael J. Guzman

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC

1615 M Street, N.W. Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Mark C. Hansen

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick PLLC

1615 M Street, N.W. Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Daniel Robert Shinoff

Attorney at Artiano Shinoff

2488 Historic Decatur Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92106-6113

James Patrick Frantz

Attorney at Frantz Law Group

402 W Broadway #860

San Diego, CA 92101

William Benjamin Shinoff

Attorney at Frantz Law Group, APLC

402 W Broadway Ste 860

San Diego, CA 92101-8506

Khaldoun Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup Melodia Kelly et al

650 California St 26Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jason J. Julius

Attorney at Baron & Budd

11440 W Bernardo Ct Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127-1663

Rahul Ravipudi

Attorney at Panish, Shea & Boyle, LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian J. Panish

Attorney at Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Rachel Tessa Gezerseh

Attorney at Panish Shea & Boyle LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025-3341

John P. Fiske

Attorney at Baron & Budd

11440 W Bernardo Ct, Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127-1663

Victoria Ellen Sherlin

Attorney at Baron and Budd P.C.

11440 W Bernardo Ct Ste 265

San Diego, CA 92127-1663

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final The petitions for writ of mandate filed on December 23, 2021 and April 7, 2022 are consolidated for consideration on the court's own motion. The pro hac vice motions in case B319547 are granted. The petition in case B319547 is denied for failure to state entitlement to extraordinary relief. The petition in case B317203 is dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The petitions for writ of mandate filed on December 23, 2021 and April 7, 2022 are consolidated for consideration on the court's own motion. The pro hac vice motions in case B319547 are granted. The petition in case B319547 is denied for failure to state entitlement to extraordinary relief. The petition in case B317203 is dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The court is in receipt of the parties' letters regarding the March 23, 2022 denial of petitioner's motion to quash after consideration of real parties' evidence. If petitioner would like to challenge that order, he should do so by filing a timely new petition supported by exhibits. (Code Civ. Proc., 418.10, subd. (c); Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b).) The pending petition in this case will remain on file and may be consolidated for review with any new petition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Letter from Counsel for RPI San Diego County Office of Education, along with copy of Notice of Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Kellogg Hansen, etc. dated March 25, 2022 re: After further briefing, the trial court heard argument on March 23. At that hearing, the court adopted its tentative order "adding rationale" to its earlier order based on "new evidence" and again denied Dr. Huh's motion to quash.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Baron Budd, PC dated March 24, 2022 re: Real Parties in Interest, Grossmont Union High School and San Diego County Office of Education (collectively referred to as "Public Entity Plaintiffs"), submit this letter to inform the Court as to the recent hearing concerning the motion that is the subject of the Writ Petition before this Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibit K to Declaration of David L. Schwarz in Support of Reply IN Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Declaration of David L. Schwarz in Support of Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick dated January 28, 2022 Re: respond to the Public Entity Plaintiffs' letter of January 27, 2022, and to respectfully request that the Court decline their invitation to defer consideration of Dr. Huh's petition for a writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Baron Budd dated January 27, 2022 re: inform the Court of a significant development that occurred in the Superior Court yesterday that directly impacts the order that is the subject of the Writ Petition now before this Court. Real Parties believe that this development will likely mean that the Court should defer consideration of this writ petition until the conclusion of presently contemplated proceedings in the trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Real Parties in Interest Grossmont Union High School District and San Diego County Office of Education, shall have an extension of time to fourteen (14) days, up to and including January 28, 2022, within which to file their Plaintiffs' Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate. Petitioner's reply is now due February 4, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: to ext opposition to 2/11/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate filed on December 23, 2021 has been read and considered. Real parties are invited to file a preliminary opposition by January 14, 2022. Petitioner may reply by January 21, 2022. The stay request is denied as unnecessary. (Code Civ. Proc., 418.10, subd. (c).) The motions for pro hac vice admission of Mark C. Hansen and Michael J. Guzman are granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Notice providing all parties correct division.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Application for pro hac vice(Michael J. Guzman)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Application for pro hac vice(Mark C. Hansen)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego County Office of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where Grossmont Union High School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victoria Ellen Sherlin