This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/26/2023 at 23:00:54 (UTC).

Huard v. Superior Court, County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 Huard filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court, County of Ventura. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bennett, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6242

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bennett, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Andrew Logan Huard

Respondent

Superior Court, County of Ventura

Interested Party

Alan Richard Eldridge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Alejandro H. Herrera

Interested Party Attorney

Carolyn Candice Phillips

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: [SEE ORDER] . . . The petition for a writ of mandate and request for an immediate stay are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Electronic docket sheet in Huard v. Eldridge, Ventura County Superior Court Case No. 56-2017-00495454-CU-OR-VTA, and the superior court's minute orders entered on: (1) July 18, 2022; (2) July 19, 2022 (10:05 A.M. hearing); (3) July 26, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less