This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/04/2023 at 09:01:10 (UTC).

Huard v. Eldridge

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 Huard filed an Other lawsuit against Eldridge. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bennett, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1707

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bennett, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Andrew Logan Huard

Respondent and Defendant

Alan Richard Eldridge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Alejandro H. Herrera

Attorney at Herrera Law Partners

100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401-3602

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Carolyn Candice Phillips

Attorney at Law Offices of Carolyn C. Phillips

2625 Townsgate Rd Ste 330

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140, California Rules of Court, the appeal filed July 19, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: DKT; You must attach to this form a copy of the judgment or order being appealed that shows the date it was entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: From VCSC; request for dismissal: notice of failure to comply with CRC 8.140. dtd 8-4-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: Failure to Designate Oral Record on Appeal due by 08/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.122(c) clerk's fees not deposited. Dated:; Notes: 7-19-2022 by VCSC; 15 days to cure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 7-19-2022 filed by A. Huard challenging 7-19-2022 order denying jury trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2017-00495454-CU-OR-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Bennett, Jeffrey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less