This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/26/2022 at 03:50:39 (UTC).

Huang v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Huang filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitaker, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6570

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Whitaker, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bing H. Huang

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Michael E. Whitaker

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Phillip Bernard

Antionette Bernard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David Belofsky

Attorney at BELOFSKY LAW GROUP, P.C.

537 W 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Joseph Page Tabrisky

Attorney at BELOFSKY LAW GROUP, P.C.

537 W.7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Paul R. Markley

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul R. Markley

2790 Skypark Drive Suite 106

Torrance, CA 90505

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered petitioner's petition for writ of mandate, filed on December 27, 2021. Petitioner is represented by counsel and is therefore barred from filing pro per motions or petitions. (See, e.g., People v. Clark (1992) 3 Cal.4th 41, 173; In re Barnett (2003) 31 Cal.4th 466, 476-477.) In addition, petitioner has failed to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Accordingly, the petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Amended Petition with Electronica Bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY. [ Exhibits Attached to Petition]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant