This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/27/2023 at 04:12:14 (UTC).

Huang et al. v. Henry Global Consulting et al.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Huang filed an Other lawsuit against Henry Global Consulting. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scheper, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7537

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Scheper, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Junyang Huang

Shenghong Cheng

Xiaole Chen

Defendants and Respondents

Henry Global Consulting

SLS Tranche 1 Lender, LLC

Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC

American Dream Fund

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey T. Bell

Attorney at The Law Offices Of

11001 Valley Mall Suite 300

El Monte, CA 91731

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jesse Abraham Kaplan

Attorney at Freedman & Taitelman LLP

1901 Ave Of The Stars Ste 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joseph J. Ybarra

Attorney at Halpern May Ybarra Gelberg LLP

550 South Hope Street Suite 2330

Los Angeles, CA 90071

S. Albert Wang

Attorney at Halpern May Ybarra Gelberg LLP

550 S Hope St Ste 2330

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2680

Witt W. Chang

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park E Ste 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3125

Belinda Martinez Vega

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park E Ste 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3125

John Sung Cha

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

18401 Von Karman Ave. Ste 360

Irvine, CA 92612-8541

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 01/03/2023 By 62 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 03/03/2023 By 59 Day(s) ***NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 03/06/2023 By 62 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Witt Chang and Belinda Vega of Venable LLP substituting as counsel for Respondent Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: as to respondents SLS Tranche 1 Lender, LLC and American Dream Fund, LLC only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's request, the appeal filed November 29, 2021 is dismissed as to respondents SLS Tranche 1 Lender, LLC and American Dream Fund, LLC only. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. (California Rules of Court, rule 8.272 (c)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellants' notice of abandonment of appeal as to SLS Tranche 1 Lender, LLC and American Dreem Fund, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Junyang Huang Attorney: Jeffrey T. Bell Plaintiff and Appellant: Shenghong Cheng Attorney: Jeffrey T. Bell Plaintiff and Appellant: Xiaole Chen Attorney: Jeffrey T. Bell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: to file appellant's opening brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: This form has been mailed to all counsel to advise that counsel for appellant has failed to file a timely appellant's appendix /opening brief and that notice of default has issued. Counsel for appellant(s) Junyang Huang et al. is hereby notified that if the brief is not on file within 15 days after the date of this notice, or good cause shown for relief from default, the appeal will be dismissed. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Dear Counsel: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice designating record filed 12/10/21; appellant proc. by CRC 8.124 w/o RTs;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Junyang Huang Attorney: Jeffrey T. Bell Plaintiff and Appellant: Shenghong Cheng Attorney: Jeffrey T. Bell Plaintiff and Appellant: Xiaole Chen Attorney: Jeffrey T. Bell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Junyang HuangAttorney: Jeffrey T. Bell Plaintiff and Appellant: Shenghong ChengAttorney: Jeffrey T. Bell Plaintiff and Appellant: Xiaole ChenAttorney: Jeffrey T. Bell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Jeffrey Bell.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 29, 2021 by Junyang Huang et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV37446; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC685035; Trial Court Judge: Scheper, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Dream Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN JESSE ABRAHAM