This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/12/2022 at 01:37:56 (UTC).

Howell et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Howell filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5737

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kim, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Kevin Howell

Haley Howell

Adam Nadow

The Jiu-Jitsu League

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Mark C. Kim

Long Beach, CA 90802

Interested Party

Ramon Pereda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Steven S. Fleischman

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Ave. 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Thomas Patrick Gmelich

Attorney at Bradley & Gmelich LLP

700 N. Brand Blvd. 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203-1422

Mark Igmedio Melo

Attorney at Bradley & Gmelick LLP

700 N. Brand Blvd. 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

Kathryn M. Canale

Attorney at Bradley & Gmelich LLP

700 No. Brand Blvd. 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

Eric S. Boorstin

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Avenue 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Ernest Joseph Franceschi, Jr.

Attorney at Franceschi Law Corporation

4640 Admiralty Way Floor 5

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

James Decker

Attorney at Decker Law

27762 Antonio Parkway Suite L-1-464

Ladera Ranch, CA 92694

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The court is in receipt of petitioner's request for dismissal of the petition for writ of mandate filed October 18, 2021. The request is granted and the petition is dismissed. All parties are to bear their own costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: request for dismissal filed by petitioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.; Notes: notice of settlement filed by petitioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply to RPI's preliminary opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee $390 due by James Decker counsel for RPI RamonResponsive filing fee paid by James Decker.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: James Decker, counsel for RPI Ramon Pereda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RPI Ramon Pereda's preliminary opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCESCHI ERNEST J. JR