This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/18/2023 at 08:00:54 (UTC).

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association v. Coachella Valley Water District

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association filed an Other lawsuit against Coachella Valley Water District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sykes, Sunshine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9795

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sykes, Sunshine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Respondent and Defendant

Coachella Valley Water District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Sara Marie McDuffie

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Michael G. Colantuono

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Pamela Kentos Graham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Appellant's request for dismissal. Clerk to issue remittitur immediately.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association Attorney: Jeffrey Lee Costell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers AssociationAttorney: Jeffrey Lee Costell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Costell & Adelson Law Corporation old address 1: 20969 Ventura Blvd., Suite 230 new address 1: 100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 700 old city: Woodland Hills new city: Santa Monica old zip: 91364 new zip: 90401

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: w/no further extns.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: AOB extn request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Sept 22, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sept 14, 2022; Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: PSC1904774; Trial Court Judge: Sykes, Sunshine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less